Financial history THE WALSALL MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1064056
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.61k £19.23k £12.03k £3.03k £29.10k
Total expenditure £0 £25.90k £31.95k £300 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A