Trustees ESCAPE FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1063500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Axelby | Chair | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alice Park | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Furno | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Holly Eloise Scarfe | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Murphy | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MURPHY | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Murphy | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DEVINE | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.