SALCARE LTD

Charity number: 1064715
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £289.08k £157.96k £141.36k £150.91k £198.36k
Total expenditure £256.76k £210.79k £186.78k £169.41k £195.23k
Income from government contracts £224.41k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £83.49k £91.00k £99.00k £81.50k