TIPPING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310593
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4205 days
Annual return 31 December 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4570 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4570 days
Annual return 31 December 2006 Overdue Overdue by 4936 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Overdue Overdue by 4936 days
Annual return 31 December 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5301 days
Annual return 31 December 2004 31 May 2005 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required