Trustees THE CANEWDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 310718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR A NICKOLLS | Chair |
|
||||||
Julian John Kaye | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Harley Kimber | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Eileen Bedford | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucia Clark | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Janet Elizabeth Craven | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ernest Anthony Guest | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Yvette Donovan | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Alan Joseph Bax | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MRS L D VAN HOUTEN | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Geraldine Louise Margaret Lunn | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.