Accounts and annual returns CHIGWELL SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 310866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 30 June 2006 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 24 November 2005 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 20 December 2004 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window