Financial history DAME ANNE TIPPING SCHOOL

Charity number: 310904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £996 £1.07k £823 £1.06k £1.08k
Total expenditure £3.16k £376 £571 £3.60k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A