Governing document HENRY COLBORN (OR COLBRON)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CODICIL TO WILL DATED 1 AUGUST 1655, AS AMENDED BY MINISTRY OF EDUCATION SCHEME DATED 2 JUNE 1955, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3 DECEMBER 2003 AND BY RESOLUTIONS OF 1 JANUARY 2006, 21 NOVEMBER 2007 AND 26 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE ASHWELL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL, AND OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASHWELL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.