Trustees ROBERT DEWHURST'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 310972
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN SELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Colin Milburn | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Taylor | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eugene Edward Hanshaw | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Cllr. Peter Chorley | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Coiuncillor Martin Greensmyth | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAULINE ORCHARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY LEE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.