Trustees ABBOT'S HILL LIMITED
Charity number: 311053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debashis Dasgupta | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hopkins | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Sims | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Edmundson | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Myers | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shori Thakur | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gillespie | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Summerton | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HART | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JAMES | Trustee | 12 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CHADWICK | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.