Trustees ST ALBANS HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Charity number: 311065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Paul Ascott | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Balbinder Singh Tattar | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bjorn Hobart | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanne Kelly- Moore | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Kironde-Strain | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Bernard | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Arnold | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elizabeth Jewell | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Murray | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Terese Carradice | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD MARTIN | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JAMES ENRIGHT | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.