TOWN LANDS (OTHERWISE FORNCETT SCHOOL ENDOWMENT LANDS)

Charity number: 311224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £78 £78 £79 £80 £64
Total expenditure £220 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A