Trustees KING EDWARD THE SIXTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL, NORWICH

Charity number: 311280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Charles Wood Chair 08 December 2017
None on record
Very Reverend Dr Andrew Jonathan Braddock Trustee 23 June 2023
FRIENDS OF NORWICH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
NORWICH CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
NORWICH CATHEDRAL CHOIR ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
Julian Sandford Wells MRICS Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Hannah Amy Salmon Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Narman Puvanachandra Trustee 09 December 2022
None on record
Anasua Roy Trustee 02 July 2021
None on record
James Michael Hunter Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
Major General Gregory Stephen Smith CB QVRM TD Trustee 22 March 2019
FOOD AND FARMING DISCOVERY TRUST
Overdue by 264 days
UNITED KINGDOM RESERVE FORCES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST (THE BMMT)
Received: On time
Henry Clive Jourdain Trustee 22 March 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ROWLEDGE
Received: On time
PAUL HENDERSON Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
NIGEL BACK Trustee 08 December 2017
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM
Received: On time
Rev Aidan Stephen George Platten Trustee 08 December 2017
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF NORWICH
Recently registered
HYMNS ANCIENT AND MODERN LIMITED
Received: On time
NORWICH CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
NORWICH CATHEDRAL CHOIR ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
Deirdre Annuncia Willmott Trustee 09 December 2016
None on record
Dr Diana Frances Wood Trustee 09 December 2016
None on record
ANTHONY RICHARD MORRELL LITTLE MA Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Mr Mark Schofield Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
MICHELLE JARROLD Trustee 12 June 2013
None on record
Dr KAY HELEN YEOMAN Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
Dr STEPHEN BAMBER Trustee 30 November 2012
None on record
DAVID W TALBOT FCA Trustee 19 March 2010
None on record
TRACY J YATES BA Trustee 15 June 2007
None on record