Financial history MUSEUM OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 311309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £132.92k £142.94k £207.47k £207.47k £263.00k
Total expenditure £115.08k £185.30k £169.09k £169.09k £255.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k £77.10k £96.31k £85.60k £185.00k