Governing document ROYAL AGRICULTURAL UNIVERSITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/08/1908 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD INSTRUCTION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN, AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO, AGRICULTURE, LAND MANAGEMENT AND OTHER SUBJECTS, BUSINESSES OR PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH LAND, FOOD OR OTHER RURAL RESOURCES OR ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.