NEWTON'S AND HATLEY'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.20k £5.31k £5.31k £5.85k £6.01k
Total expenditure £3.97k £4.20k £4.20k £5.84k £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A