Trustees THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE

Charity number: 312046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Thomas Chair 03 January 2013
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
WOODLANDS SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ALEXANDER MURRAY RUSSELL Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
John Bowerman Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Tania Botting Trustee 01 March 2023
FRIENDS OF GREENFIELD SCHOOL
Received: On time
Belinda Dolbear Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Katharine Davidson QC Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Andrew Pianca Trustee 15 June 2016
MOIRA HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity is insolvent
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
John Hay Trustee 15 June 2016
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
CLIVE WATSON Trustee 15 June 2016
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Richard Bruce Trustee 04 December 2013
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
SIR JOHN SCARLETT Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF THE FRENCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Dr JEREMY BOLTON Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Dr HYWEL BOWEN-PERKINS Trustee
KINGSWOOD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
LORD CARLILE Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Dr SUNDEEP DHILLON Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
DEJ MAHONEY Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
GEORGE PINCUS Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Dr ANDREW JOHN VALLANCE-OWEN Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days
Dr ALASTAIR WELLS Trustee
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 53 days