Trustees DAME MARY MORISON FOR APPRENTICES

Charity number: 312129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Felicity Evans Chair 21 September 2021
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Tanyaradzwa Machisa Trustee 18 September 2023
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Hulya Kozan Trustee 19 June 2023
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Michael Peter Jeremy TUNSTALL Trustee 20 September 2022
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Marilyn Devonish Trustee 21 September 2021
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr NIGEL INESON Trustee 21 September 2021
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Mould Trustee 15 March 2016
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev TONY RINDL Trustee 25 April 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S WATFORD
Received: On time
WATFORD TOWN CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Overdue by 233 days
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WATFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DOROTHY LONGLAND BEQUEST
Received: On time
ROGER BRICE FROST Trustee 25 April 2013
BEDFORD MORISON AND CORDERY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time