ST MARYLEBONE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £178.77k £273.69k £267.33k £266.52k £264.87k
Total expenditure £188.32k £463.16k £81.95k £200.03k £241.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A