Financial history GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 312380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £505 £297 £452 £624 £305
Total expenditure £0 £9.92k £10.21k £10.52k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A