Trustees THE CAVENDISH SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 312727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elham Saudi | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenda FONTAINE | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ersilia Molnar | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Crystal | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bettison | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Webster | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pangonis | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alice Gotto | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola RUSHTON | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathrin HAKE | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.