Trustees THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART
Charity number: 312819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Ryder | Chair | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH CHAN | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Millie Boardman | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Morton | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Baroness Judith Blake | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Professor Judith Buchanan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Miranda Wayland | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Niamh Dowling | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Spicer | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Helen Selwood | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Shona Spence | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Collins | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Nicole Snyder | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Chipo Chung | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Tanya Rose | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Romeo | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
TIM CLARK | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Maxine Peake | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lolita Chakrabarti OBE | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Tamar Ann Thomas | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RISHI MADLANI | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.