Financial history THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 313001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.14m £2.62m £2.77m £17.28m £9.23m
Total expenditure £2.17m £2.28m £2.45m £6.44m £10.90m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £299.21k £752.42k £754.90k £15.16m £7.26m
Income - Other trading activities £601.94k £592.55k £591.67k £547.40k £554.79k
Income - Charitable activities £666.50k £630.21k £642.75k £620.65k £605.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £9.13k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £568.58k £644.14k £785.44k £951.64k £817.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £2.16m £2.25m £6.10m £10.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £141.74k £119.37k £192.35k £345.94k £511.35k
Expenditure - Governance £44.41k £59.69k £57.89k £46.47k £55.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £4.10m £7.67m
Expenditure - Investment management £24.36k £26.58k £27.17k £22.33k £24.48k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0