Trustees FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL LIBRARIES
Charity number: 313020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Geordie Greig | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Rhodri Llwyd Morgan | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Tina Michelle Morton | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Henry Storey | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Philip Stevens | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Henry Charles Whittick | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Joan Sanborn Harris Winterkorn MBE | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Anne Frances Gibson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Margaret Barker | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Amina Shah | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Alan Linenthal | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sybil Elsa Maria Kretzmer | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN PETER CLARKE | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Jessica Pearsall Gardner | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor RICHARD OVENDEN OBE | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||
ROLAND FRANCIS KESTER KEATING | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Charles Adam Laurie Sebag-Montefiore CBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.