Governing document METHODIST INDEPENDENT EDUCATION TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 DEC 1903 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 JAN 1967 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 JUN 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES INCLUDING BUT NOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES WHETHER IN CONNEXION WITH THE PURPOSES OF SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.