Trustees FIELD STUDIES COUNCIL
Charity number: 313364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof PETER HIGGINS | Chair | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Goddard | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Ruth Copeland-Phillips | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter O'Loughlin | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Christie | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Beatty OBE | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Craig | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Jeff Sissons | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Prof NICHOLAS HOWDEN FGS | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Anderson | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Marrs | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lane | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gill Miller | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.