Financial history THE NEW BERLIOZ EDITION TRUST

Charity number: 313413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.38k £119.43k £23.80k £35.29k £32.59k
Total expenditure £233 £3.18k £25.72k £35.47k £20.98k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A