Financial history A P SCOTT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 313521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.92k £3.06k £3.28k £3.11k £2.40k
Total expenditure £4.92k £4.92k £5.72k £5.60k £5.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A