THE PAUL MELLON CENTRE FOR STUDIES IN BRITISH ART

Charity number: 313838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £4.49m £4.92m £4.52m £4.90m £6.48m
Total expenditure £3.96m £3.72m £4.24m £4.83m £5.28m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.61k £4.06m £4.30m £5.31m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £695.36k £213.69k £203.70k £759.19k
Income - Charitable activities £4.46m £4.19m £231.55k £379.56k £372.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.32k £29.89k £18.79k £23.71k £40.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.96m £3.72m £4.24m £4.83m £5.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £65.95k £88.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £233.30k £0 £0 £429.52k £558.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0