Financial history ST CATHERINE'S BRITISH SCHOOL

Charity number: 313909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £11.85m £12.85m £13.03m £12.78m £13.71m
Total expenditure £10.45m £10.70m £10.68m £11.42m £13.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £16.40k £21.03k £309.25k £72.27k £171.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.32m £11.93m £12.24m £12.11m £12.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £508 £268 £290 £484 £62.26k
Income - Other £517.73k £899.88k £477.93k £603.58k £994.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.45m £10.70m £10.68m £11.42m £13.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.96k £18.16k £17.83k £12.94k £13.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0