Trustees THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 314286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE CREASY Chair 18 May 2017
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Suela Aksoy Trustee 12 May 2023
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
David Crowther Trustee 12 May 2023
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Nick Tesseyman Trustee 12 May 2023
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr John Kanyaru Trustee 13 May 2022
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Anood Al-Samerai Trustee 14 May 2021
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Janice Miller Trustee 01 July 2020
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Charlotte Cashman Trustee 17 May 2019
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID BARON Trustee 18 May 2018
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR JOY PALMER COOPER Trustee 15 May 2016
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time