Trustees LITTLEGARTH SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 325064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Keohane | Chair | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Stafford | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Oliver | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Glegg | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Gee | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Stevens | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harish Mahadevappa | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Frances Oats | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHARLOTTE MCKENNA | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MAJOR GENERAL DAVID BURDEN CB CVO CBE | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.