Financial history E B M CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.28m £1.31m £1.47m £1.40m £1.40m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.67m £1.45m £1.78m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £332 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.28m £1.31m £1.47m £1.40m £1.40m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £332 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.39m £1.17m £1.50m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £270.59k £281.67k £282.70k £278.49k £291.20k
Expenditure - Governance £78.48k £163.07k £144.57k £132.32k £138.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.35m £1.23m £1.02m £1.37m £1.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £270.59k £281.67k £282.70k £278.49k £291.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0