Trustees THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF ENERGY ECONOMICS
Charity number: 326875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Peter Taylor | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jorge Blazquez Lidoy | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thompson | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Geard | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wood | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Hannon | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alec Waterhouse | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mallika Ishwaran | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Volker Beckers | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Screen | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
George Alexander Day | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR YELENA KALYUZHNOVA | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT JOHN KIRKALDY GROSS | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARETH DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.