Financial history AGE EXCHANGE

Charity number: 326899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £596.24k £566.61k £693.82k £621.04k £537.85k
Total expenditure £649.59k £664.66k £718.53k £579.34k £548.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.89k £48.89k £88.50k £167.67k £57.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £339.37k £298.24k £419.58k £504.26k £349.47k
Income - Other trading activities £103.91k £103.25k £107.24k £69.43k £94.99k
Income - Charitable activities £148.76k £160.56k £162.42k £43.16k £86.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.21k £4.56k £4.58k £4.19k £6.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £4.51k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £548.41k £565.80k £614.25k £504.27k £469.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds £101.18k £98.85k £104.28k £75.07k £78.96k
Expenditure - Governance £7.04k £3.73k £7.52k £11.38k £9.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0