Financial history THE CLIVE AND SYLVIA RICHARDS CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 327155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £636.24k £1.59m £509.18k £1.81m £425.80k
Total expenditure £1.19m £805.81k £1.45m £1.06m £655.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £371.86k £1.46m £440.50k £1.73m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £126.85k £137.15k £68.68k £74.81k N/A
Income - Other £137.53k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £805.81k £1.45m £1.06m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £20.57k £5.52k £6.02k £55.76k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.12m £760.85k £1.35m £977.75k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A