Governing document EASTMAN FOUNDATION FOR ORAL RESEARCH AND TRAINING (EFFORT)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 22 MARCH 1993, 1ST JUNE 1994, 27TH JANUARY 1999 AND 13TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS THE PREVENTION AND STUDY OF DISEASE (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THIS CLAUSE) DISEASES OF THE ORAL AND DENTAL TISSUES AND ALLIED STRUCTURES AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND GENERALLY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE MEANS OF PREVENTION DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT AND CURE OF SUCH DISEASES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3(2) & (3)).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.