Trustees GEESE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Charity number: 327563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Kobina Hall | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Owen | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kam Singh Sarai | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA JOY FRITH | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARK BAIM | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SELWYN CHARLES BLYTH | Trustee | 09 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
IAIN JAMES LOWNES | Trustee | 08 November 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.