PRESTON CITY MISSION

Charity number: 327566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £35.70k £39.79k £53.79k £31.38k £40.28k
Total expenditure £35.24k £24.29k £43.23k £39.24k £33.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A