Trustees EQUITY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 328103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Rogers | Chair | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harold Finley | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
David John Steele | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tonia Campbell | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
elizabeth Cooper | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Williams | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachael Clare Fagan | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shenagh Govan | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shalom Lee-Ramsbottom | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Grainger | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Cummings Thompson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nigel Gilchrist | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ross | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLIVER ROBERT FORD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN CLIVE TALBOT OBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
robin browne | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.