Governing document THE ANGLICAN FELLOWSHIP
Charity number: 328395
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 12 APRIL 1986, 20 JUNE 1987 AND 21 OCTOBER 1989 AND 15 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.