Trustees CHRISTIAN ECOLOGY LINK
Charity number: 328744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Mary Tomkins | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Robinson | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Peter Bowsher | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Fr Andrew Norman CJN | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Isobel Lucy Margaret Murdoch | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Payne | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|||||||
ELEANOR MARY ORR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BARBARA JILL ECHLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TIM COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ASHLEY RALSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL JAMES BODENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GEORGE DOW | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.