Financial history Maranatha Community Church (Wiltshire)

Charity number: 1061916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.37k £62.36k £59.38k £61.43k £47.80k
Total expenditure £64.12k £56.64k £53.26k £58.30k £36.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A