Trustees ZWARTBLES SHEEP ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1062319
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Russell Pearse | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Case | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin David Rae | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Simpson | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Baird | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Ann Bissett | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Addison | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Johnston Gibson | Trustee | 08 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Blamire | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL JAMES CROMIE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JOEL HEIGH | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.