Financial history ISUOG COURSES AND CONFERENCES LIMITED

Charity number: 1063743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.17m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.54m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £520
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.72k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.11m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £37.99k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £202.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0