THE WALTON ON THE NAZE YMCA RED TRIANGLE CLUB

Charity number: 1068668
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.28k £8.74k £11.39k £11.40k £11.13k
Total expenditure £10.17k £6.67k £7.73k £7.73k £6.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A