CRANSTOUN

Charity number: 1061582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.71m £19.56m £24.39m £21.10m £24.10m
Total expenditure £15.96m £19.64m £24.46m £21.47m £19.73m
Income from government contracts £15.27m £19.25m £22.78m £20.86m £18.75m
Income from government grants £270.00k £0 N/A £157.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.00k £9.00k £12.00k £8.00k £15.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.69m £19.25m £24.37m £21.07m £19.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.00k £25.00k £9.00k £20.00k £34.00k
Income - Other £0 £275.00k £0 £0 £4.26m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.96m £19.64m £24.20m £21.47m £19.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £48.00k £84.00k £109.00k £101.00k £90.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £253.00k £0 £0