Trustees INSTITUTE FOR SMALL BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP LIMITED
Charity number: 1076159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Andrew Henley | Chair | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Beaumont | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Lowry Newbery | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Steven Johnson | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof. David Grant Pickernell | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Whysnianti Basuki | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nkechi Adeeko | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Phillips | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dobson | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marc Cowling | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Bennett | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sue Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Natalia Vershinina | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elinor Vettraino | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joan Lockyer | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorna Treanor | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Endrit Kromidha | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KIRAN TREHAN | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Breda O'Dwyer | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.