Trustees NATIONAL RURAL TOURING FORUM
Charity number: 1062366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Speight | Chair | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Prior | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Higgins | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Emyr Bell | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND JOHN O'DRISCOLL | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Bridgman | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Barbara Tremewan | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES STUART LAIDLAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN LOUISE BADLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.