Financial history THE FRIEDEL HELENE WALSINGHAM AWARD

Charity number: 1063027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/01/2018 09/01/2019 09/01/2020 09/01/2021 09/01/2022
Total gross income £4.40k £5.57k £5.57k £2.38k £2.82k
Total expenditure £4.17k £5.00k £5.76k £5.19k £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A